Accounts and annual returns SAVE JAMAICA FUND

Charity number: 1109306
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 July 2007 20 February 2009 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2007 17 October 2008 169 days late
Annual return 01 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2006 23 August 2007 83 days late