Financial history Relate Mid & East Surrey

Charity number: 1108239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £446.87k £390.00k £362.46k £348.92k £342.89k
Total expenditure £406.56k £396.00k £405.94k £383.19k £437.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £72.00k £5.33k £9.21k N/A