Financial history CanalAbility

Charity number: 1108452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.54k £80.10k £75.90k £85.57k £84.67k
Total expenditure £96.56k £54.68k £70.95k £91.76k £85.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.33k £32.08k £1.92k £16.05k £5.38k