Financial history THE KHAO LAK COMMUNITY APPEAL

Charity number: 1108806
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £13.76k £9.96k £10.87k £11.16k £15.54k
Total expenditure £103.50k £34.82k £21.39k £13.92k £670.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0