Accounts and annual returns RED HOUSE PATIENTS GROUP

Charity number: 1109702
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 14 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 22 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 11 August 2011 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required