Trustees BISLEY WI VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1108590
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL ROGERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jane Neighbour | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Chapman | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Adam Scotchmer | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Scotchmer | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maidie Wakefield | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Saunders | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Allan Sapsed | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Lane | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY C A WATSON | Trustee | 14 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHELAGH UTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STELLA MULLIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.