Financial history RATNAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1108787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £146.63k £115.01k £65.23k £49.48k £48.29k
Total expenditure £63.13k £92.94k £60.67k £86.47k £54.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A