Financial history KETTERING U3A

Charity number: 1108614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £6.36k £470 £3.36k £4.27k £3.14k
Total expenditure £5.21k £410 £2.93k £3.58k £4.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A