Financial history THE LOUGHBOROUGH NEW FRONTIERS CHURCH - THE WELL

Charity number: 1109526
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £120.69k £128.93k £117.51k £12.03k £0
Total expenditure £108.45k £110.39k £107.09k £102.80k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A