Accounts and annual returns EURO STREAMS

Charity number: 1108943
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 07 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 November 2008 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 29 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 30 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 30 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 16 July 2007 258 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 16 July 2007 258 days late