Financial history REPHAEL HOUSE

Charity number: 1109437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £268.39k £364.66k £363.81k £420.88k £476.04k
Total expenditure £259.20k £268.94k £320.65k £408.93k £493.80k
Income from government contracts £62.91k £88.50k £110.21k £138.75k £129.60k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £14.83k £3.90k £1.00k