Accounts and annual returns CARE PAKISTAN

Charity number: 1109138
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 25 April 2025 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 25 April 2025 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 January 2025 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 January 2025 333 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 March 2023 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 March 2023 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 27 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 March 2022 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 March 2022 415 days late Download Open in new window