Accounts and annual returns PENTECOST BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1110297
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 March 2024 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 March 2024 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window