Financial history BISHOP TACHBROOK SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1109127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.65k £6.67k £3.19k £2.67k £7.13k
Total expenditure £4.02k £7.58k £2.37k £1.44k £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A