Financial history CARDIFF PEOPLE FIRST

Charity number: 1109221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £149.99k £163.87k £174.81k £165.32k £184.41k
Total expenditure £178.45k £163.17k £161.34k £125.01k £153.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.80k N/A
Income from government grants £60.03k £83.73k £64.45k £80.95k N/A