Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BISHOP JUSTUS

Charity number: 1109177
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 November 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 March 2023 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2022 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required