Accounts and annual returns DROP IN - INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, CHESHUNT, HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1111604
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 24 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 December 2007 On Time