Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF HADRIANS WALL

Charity number: 1109589
Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 July 2023 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required