Financial history THE WINDING HOUSE

Charity number: 1109724
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2008 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012
Total gross income £1.43k £378 £24 £91 £1.07k
Total expenditure £386 £576 £1.02k £13.75k £6.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A