Accounts and annual returns CAR ACCIDENT VICTIMS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1110401
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 31 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 06 June 2008 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required