Financial history Safer Communities Limited

Charity number: 1112657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.18m £2.35m £2.28m £1.09m £754.44k
Total expenditure £2.33m £2.07m £1.99m £1.06m £973.26k
Income from government contracts £1.04m £1.67m £1.82m £911.50k £679.62k
Income from government grants £252.40k £355.73k £312.21k £176.61k £8.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.99m £2.12m £2.03m £1.09m £25.59k
Income - Other trading activities £178.01k £204.28k £236.33k £2.52k £2.69k
Income - Charitable activities £10.55k £27.58k £11.97k £0 £718.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £69 £0 £0
Income - Investment £646 £126 £0 £3.19k £7.32k
Income - Other £675 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.33m £2.07m £1.99m £1.06m £973.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £331.74k £352.41k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0