Financial history BRIDGES TO BELARUS - HELPING CHILDREN AFFECTED BY THE CHERNOBYL DISASTER

Charity number: 1109946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £16.60k £8.60k £5.08k £5.41k £4.28k
Total expenditure £16.06k £1.04k £763 £513 £577
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A