Accounts and annual returns BROMLEY CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1110822
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 25 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required