Accounts and annual returns HEADSTART4BABIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1112256
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 December 2024 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 December 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 December 2020 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late Download Open in new window