Accounts and annual returns IPSWICH AND COASTAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORUM

Charity number: 1111206
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 06 June 2007 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time