Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST ANNE'S NANTWICH

Charity number: 1110170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 26 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 June 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 04 July 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required