Accounts and annual returns THE REGAN VON SCHWEITZER EDUCATION FUND

Charity number: 1111595
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2015 19 March 2016 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2014 28 June 2015 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not Required