Accounts and annual returns NORTH LONDON CHRISTIAN REVIVAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1110498
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2013 19 December 2013 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2013 19 December 2013 19 days late
Annual return 31 January 2012 14 December 2012 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 14 December 2012 14 days late
Annual return 31 January 2011 22 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 07 May 2011 On Time