Financial history THE ORCHARD CENTRE (LONDONDERRY)

Charity number: 1111479
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £5.41k £6.25k £7.53k £9.97k £6.58k
Total expenditure £14.23k £10.15k £5.79k £9.81k £9.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A