Accounts and annual returns FERNWOOD COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110719
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 14 July 2019 05 June 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 14 July 2018 27 September 2019 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 14 July 2017 25 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2017 Not Required