Financial history HOME-START HARLOW

Charity number: 1110722
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £97.62k £117.02k £105.63k £56.07k £45.32k
Total expenditure £117.32k £105.15k £139.86k £82.23k £63.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £32.63k £0