ONCE IN A LIFETIME LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 11 January 2006: Standard registration
- ONCE IN A LIFETIME (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Anthonisz Mrs | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|||||
COLIN BRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN ANTHONISZ | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £7.62k | £5.73k | £4.49k | £18.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.51k | £10.34k | £7.68k | £3.98k | £9.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF SRI LANKA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL DISASTERS AND/OR THOSE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONCE IN A LIFETIME LIMITED
15 Thornton Place
LONDON
W1H 1FL
- Phone:
- 02074865235
- Email:
- admin@oialcharity.org
- Website:
-
oialcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window