Accounts and annual returns CANTLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1110793
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 April 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 April 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window