Accounts and annual returns NEW ENDEAVOURS TRAINING LTD

Charity number: 1111822
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 09 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 22 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 07 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 04 July 2010 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 24 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 02 June 2009 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 25 March 2009 On Time