Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM RECORD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111274
Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 March 2025 506 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 March 2025 506 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 July 2023 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required