Financial history CHASDEI RAIZEL

Charity number: 1111951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.57k £18.73k £18.18k £18.00k £138.00k
Total expenditure £25.58k £14.14k £38.27k £20.39k £73.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A