Financial history BRIERLEY HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL HELPING HANDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110921
Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £2.01k £2.20k £813 £180 £860
Total expenditure £1.08k £672 £519 £760 £486
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A