Accounts and annual returns ONE CHILD

Charity number: 1112352
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 03 February 2017 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2015 25 January 2017 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2014 21 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2013 27 January 2014 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required