Accounts and annual returns LES AMIS DE LA FRATERNITE SACERDOTALE SAINT PIERRE A LONDRES

Charity number: 1110944
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 03 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 01 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required