Accounts and annual returns THE MUSLIM ART AND CULTURAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1111525
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 23 April 2011 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 February 2010 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required