Financial history WELDON CE SCHOOL PARENTS, FRIENDS & TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1111043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £17.82k £0 £3.53k £12.99k £11.99k
Total expenditure £4.52k £0 £3.51k £3.80k £594
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A