Accounts and annual returns EPIPHANY CHRISTIAN FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1111597
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 12 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 17 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 21 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2014 12 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not Required