Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF CANTERBURY NZ TRUST

Charity number: 1111164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.92k £756.04k £276 £515 £5.48k
Total expenditure £7.75k £14.46k £754.32k £2 £1.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £756.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £5 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £750.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £14.33k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £850 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £13.48k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £132 N/A N/A N/A