Financial history FRITH MANOR PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1111511
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £21.07k £25.90k £25.27k £22.50k £2
Total expenditure £19.17k £31.04k £21.30k £26.45k £7.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A