Accounts and annual returns THE SMITHERS & CO CHARITY

Charity number: 1111374
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2013 29 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 25 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 24 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required