Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM GEOFFREY HOWARD LOWE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1112257
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 14 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 29 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 02 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 02 September 2013 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2012 02 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required