Financial history THE JOSEPH PROJECT

Charity number: 1112380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £55.24k £46.43k £62.25k £139.71k £0
Total expenditure £71.98k £69.02k £79.11k £83.07k £0
Income from government contracts £37.75k £29.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A