Financial history THE PHOENIX CONCERT BAND AND INSTRUMENTAL ENSEMBLES

Charity number: 1112536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.30k £6.46k £7.30k £10.67k £11.15k
Total expenditure £8.59k £6.56k £7.98k £11.32k £9.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A