Accounts and annual returns WITHYCOMBE RALEIGH CHURCH BELL RESTORATION FUND
Charity number: 1112089
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 02 August 2009 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 30 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window