Accounts and annual returns CORBY STEEL GATEWAY MENCAP

Charity number: 1111938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 13 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 23 September 2024 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 June 2023 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 June 2023 454 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 March 2022 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required